SELBOURNE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
.Meetings are held on Sundays and other days of the week which are open to the public.These meetings are for worship, bible teaching and preaching regularly. The building is registered for weddings (with Authorised Persons) and funeral services are held for members and others occasionally. We have special meetings to which invitations are widely distributed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Luton
Governance
- 19 July 2011: Standard registration
- SELBOURNE GOSPEL HALL; (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN COLIN CHAMPION | Chair | 19 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Ronald George Carter | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew David Perkins | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barry Peter White | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.09k | £6.76k | £18.00k | £19.02k | £17.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.42k | £7.49k | £16.70k | £25.16k | £11.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 25 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED AS AMENDED BY THE CHARITABLE TRUSTS (VALIDATION) ACT 1954 02/12/1937
Charitable objects
UPON TRUST TO MAINTAIN AND KEEP THE SAID HEREDITAMENTS IN SUITABLE AND PROPER REPAIR SO FAR AS THE PURPOSES OF THE TRUST DEMAND AND SO FAR AS FUNDS ARE AVAILABLE FOR SUCH REPAIRS AND ARE FROM TIME TO TIME RECEIVED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR SUCH PURPOSES AND TO PERMIT THE SAID LAND AND PREMISES AND ALL OR ANY BUILDING OR BUILDINGS WHICH ARE NOW OR MAY HERAFTER BE ERECTED UPON ANY OF THE SAID LAND OR ANY PART THEREOF BE USED FOR THE PURPOSES OF AN ASSEMBLY OF CHRISTIANS COMMONLY KNOWN AS OPEN BRETHREN WHO SHALL HOLD THE DOCTRINES AND SHALL BE ADDICTED TO THE PRACTICES SET FORTH IN THE SECOND AND THIRD SCHEDULES HERETO.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Selbourne Gospel Hall
144 Waller Avenue
LUTON
LU4 9RS
- Phone:
- 07766 678664
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window