LUVELY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LuvEly, a charity based at the Lighthouse Centre. Our doors are open for people of all backgrounds, no matter their personal beliefs or situation in life. We aim to bring together the community, offering practical help and tackling isolation. Through social clubs for the elderly, youth clubs. The community fridge (LuvEly Pantry) tackles food waste and helps those in need,
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £5,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 13 May 2011: Standard registration
- GCT (Working name)
- GARAGE COMMUNITY TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GILES ANTONY CORNELL | Chair | 20 February 2013 |
|
|||||
Amina Oguguo | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|||||
Tom Cockerton | Trustee | 03 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Okoye | Trustee | 15 January 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.74k | £16.22k | £16.14k | £27.05k | £36.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.14k | £11.69k | £18.62k | £24.50k | £34.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.00k | £500 | £5.00k | £5.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13/07/2011 AS AMENDED ON 20/09/2015
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY IN FURTHERING THE FOLLOWING OBJECTIVES: A. TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH AREAS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT BY: THE ADVANCEMENT OF SOCIAL AND GENERAL, FORMAL AND INFORMAL EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FOR THE RECREATION OF CHILDREN UP TO 19 YEARS OF AGE AND YOUNG PEOPLE WITH SPECIAL NEEDS UP TO THE AGE OF 25 IN THE DISTRICT OF EAST CAMBS, BY MAKING FACILITIES AND SERVICES AVAILABLE TO THEM OUT OF SCHOOL HOURS AND DURING SCHOOL HOLIDAYS; TO DEVELOP THEIR MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND SPIRITUAL NEEDS; TO HELP THEM IN THEIR FULFILMENT AS MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND AS INDIVIDUALS TO IMPROVE THEIR SOCIAL AWARENESS AND ENJOYMENT OF LIFE. B. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES AND SERVICES TO THE WIDER LOCAL COMMUNITY TO ADVANCE SOCIAL COHESION, WELFARE AND ENRICH LIFE PHYSICALLY, EMOTIONALLY AND SPIRITUALLY IN THE LOCALITY BY: (I) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS; (II) THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH; (III) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. C. ANY SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Lighthouse Church
13 Lynn Road
ELY
CB7 4EG
- Phone:
- 01353 662228
- Email:
- gilescornell@me.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window