MALVERN COMMUNITY FOREST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Establish, maintain and use woodland and other environmental assets for the educational, health and environmental benefit of the local and wider community. Work in partnership with communities, charities and other agencies to increase the awareness, knowledge, appreciation and involvement of the general public with trees, woodland, other environmental assets and associated crafts and skills.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Herefordshire
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 21 July 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID MUNDAY | Chair | 02 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Brian Philip Iles | Trustee | 11 August 2021 |
|
|||||
IAN CALDWELL | Trustee | 19 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Linda Hirschhorn | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT TILLEY | Trustee | 28 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.79k | £2.59k | £776 | £165 | £1.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.25k | £1.66k | £2.90k | £421 | £1.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 February 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/02/2009 AS AMENDED ON 19 MAR 2017
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH, MAINTAIN AND USE WOODLAND AND OTHER ENVIRONMENTAL ASSETS FOR THE EDUCATIONAL, HEALTH AND ENVIRONMENTAL BENEFIT OF THE LOCAL AND WIDER COMMUNITY TO WORK IN PARTNERSHIP WITH COMMUNITIES, CHARITIES AND OTHER AGENCIES TO INCREASE THE AWARENESS, KNOWLEDGE, APPRECIATION AND INVOLVEMENT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC WITH TREES, WOODLAND, OTHER ENVIRONMENTAL ASSETS AND ASSOCIATED CRAFTS AND SKILLS
Contact information
- Address:
-
83 Madresfield Road
MALVERN
Worcestershire
WR14 2NW
- Phone:
- 01684566200
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window