Financial history Net Church Dartford

Charity number: 1141375
Charity reporting is up to date (50 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £348.28k £343.24k £309.75k £408.45k £952.21k
Total expenditure £310.53k £268.86k £358.99k £393.35k £750.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £694.74k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £251.19k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.89k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £736.86k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £13.40k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.98k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £2.90k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0