Financial history AUTISM EARLY SUPPORT TRUST LIMITED

Charity Number: 1141868
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £525.83k £528.59k £655.19k £603.99k £646.90k
Total expenditure £529.31k £552.57k £692.02k £720.17k £709.51k
Income from government contracts N/A £107.30k £60.09k £83.14k £94.69k
Income from government grants £48.11k £227 £129.65k £5.00k £1.00k
Income - Donations and legacies £324.20k £277.03k £321.64k £250.22k £450.73k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £193.77k £246.07k £326.45k £344.64k £361.96k
Income - Endowments £0 £277.03k £0 £0 £180.00k
Income - Investment £3.85k £1.26k £2.11k £4.13k £9.21k
Income - Other £4.00k £4.23k £5.00k £5.00k £5.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £469.64k £489.88k £610.28k £639.42k £638.93k
Expenditure - Raising funds £59.67k £62.69k £81.74k £80.76k £70.58k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £5.30k £0 £1.74k £2.57k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0