CHRIST CHURCH CHINEHAM, BASINGSTOKE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Regular public worship. Space for personal prayer and contemplation. Pastoral work visiting the sick, bereaved etc. Teaching Christianity - sermons,small groups, assemblies in schools. Whole Mission activities - children, youth, adults, parents, older people, events & meetings. Supports Christian charities worldwide. Employs people to promote these as appropriate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,500 from 3 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 29 June 2011: Standard registration
- CHRIST CHURCH CHINEHAM (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Jonathan Clark | Chair | 31 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Graham Ellsmore | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Denise Bain | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stuart James Woosnam | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Olufunke Akinleye | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Elizabeth Wilson | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Christopher Young | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOSEY | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Rowlands | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Olumide Ojo-Oratokhai | Trustee | 07 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Garner | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £215.27k | £176.01k | £221.53k | £208.81k | £235.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £198.13k | £177.41k | £195.10k | £195.54k | £226.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £43.17k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £800 | £43.17k | £628 | £1.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 23 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 27/03/2011
Charitable objects
THE PURPOSE OF THE CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF THE PARTICIPATING CHURCHES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Christ Church
Reading Road
BASINGSTOKE
BASINGSTOKE
Hampshire
RG24 8LT
- Phone:
- 01256474280
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window