VALE OF EVESHAM CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting the Vale of Evesham Civic Society, by Lectures and Visits to places of great interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 07 November 1972: Standard registration
- 09 August 2013: Removed (Does not operate)
- 28 October 2015: Re-registered
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zoe Stephens | Trustee | 08 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paula Bowden | Trustee | 11 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tim Haines | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gill Pawson | Trustee | 01 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pat Stanton | Trustee | 28 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Ian Stanton | Trustee | 28 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Peake | Trustee | 28 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN CHILVER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.99k | £1.60k | £2.84k | £3.37k | £2.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.75k | £1.29k | £2.18k | £5.35k | £2.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 11 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 01 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 20 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED JULY 1972
Charitable objects
A) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. B) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. C) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
VALE OF EVESHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 MOUNT ROAD
EVESHAM
WR11 3HE
- Phone:
- 01386244964
- Email:
- vecs1972@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window