Financial history JOSS SEARCHLIGHT

Charity number: 1141704
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £95.69k £102.17k £109.95k £111.45k £117.99k
Total expenditure £92.59k £51.46k £60.47k £129.88k £125.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.00k N/A N/A N/A