JOSS SEARCHLIGHT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the needs of children suffering from brain cancer & their families through the provision of a co-ordinated support service including but not by way of limitation by offering practical & emotional support for families affected by a child's terminal diagnosis. We are dedicated to the funding of scientific & clinical research into devastating brain cancers, improved diagnostics & care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
44 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 May 2011: Standard registration
- JOSS PARKES SEARCHLIGHT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tina Elder | Trustee | 24 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA LEWINGTON | Trustee | 26 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
DIANNE LAURA PARKES | Trustee | 04 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL MANDRE PARKES | Trustee | 04 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE ZANITA JEAN SHERIDAN | Trustee | 04 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £95.69k | £102.17k | £109.95k | £111.45k | £117.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.59k | £51.46k | £60.47k | £129.88k | £125.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £2.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 27 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/09/2013
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND ARE RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM CANCER AND THEIR FAMILIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A CO-ORDINATED SUPPORT SERVICE INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION BY OFFERING PRACTICAL AND EMOTIONAL SUPPORT FOR FAMILIES AFFECTED BY A CHILD'S TERMINAL DIAGNOSIS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Station House
15 Station Lane
Witney
Oxfordshire
OX28 4BB
- Phone:
- 07770396809
- Email:
- josssearchlight@me.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window