PROJECT ORCHID LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We work to shape the dialogue around female genital cutting (FGC) and advocate for prioritisation of the issue, communicate the scale and impact of FGC and how it is ending, and support the efforts of organisations working towards abandonment in practising countries.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£853,420
Donations and legacies | £72.27k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £711.15k | |
Investments | £3.15k | |
Other | £66.85k |
Total expenditure:
£1,226,245
Raising funds | £82.48k | |
Charitable activities | £1.14m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £82.48k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.14m |
People

6 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Denmark
- India
- Kenya
- Malaysia
- Senegal
- Somalia
- Tanzania
Governance
- 01 April 2011: Standard registration
- 11 May 2023: Funds received from 1150379 28 TOO MANY
- ORCHID PROJECT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joseph Ssali Ssentongo | Chair | 17 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Carina-Carmelina Maria Petra Hirsh El-Kabbany | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andreas Ernst Zielke | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alice Nassimbwa Feldwick | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Delphine Anne Rive | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dimiana Kamal Farag | Trustee | 22 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
DR Carole Bridget Presern | Trustee | 19 January 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £829.08k | £822.42k | £1.43m | £1.59m | £853.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.13m | £907.90k | £1.21m | £1.21m | £1.23m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £63.01k | £54.80k | £260.09k | £93.93k | £72.27k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £711.15k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £765.46k | £767.53k | £1.17m | £1.41m | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £603 | £100 | £82 | £909 | £3.15k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £80.15k | £66.85k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £169.93k | £21.62k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.13m | £814.46k | £1.13m | £1.13m | £1.14m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £93.44k | £76.81k | £86.01k | £82.48k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £5.70k | £3.90k | £0 | £4.25k | £6.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.90k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £544.92k | £889.61k | £711.44k | £1.03m | £779.25k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £223.69k | £653.86k | £252.86k | £197.94k | £322.48k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INCORPORATED 13/12/2010
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("OBJECTS") ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: (1) TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS IN PARTICULAR FEMALE GENITAL CUTTING ("FGC") AS AN INFRINGEMENT OF HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; (B) OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; (C) RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; (D) RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; (E) PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS; (F) CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW; (G) COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION; (H) RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; (I) PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; (J) PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; (K) INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS; AND (L) ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC RELATING TO FGC. (3) TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF FGC.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
W1 Office Ltd
12 Old Bond Street
LONDON
LONDON
W1S 4PW
- Phone:
- 020 3752 5503
- Email:
- info@orchidproject.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window