THE ROSITA TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Rosita Trust aims to support a Kenyan not for profit organisation called Medeva. It provides education and training to young people looking to work in television and radio in East Africa. The Trust also aims to support a medical centre in Ulu,Kenya to serve a rural population of 30000 that otherwise would have no proximate access to a primary healthcare facility.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kenya
Governance
- 07 April 2011: Standard registration
- 28 January 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 28 January 2021: Funds transferred to 1155626 S.A.F.E.: ARTS FOR EDUCATION
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | 05/04/2017 | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1 | £11 | |
|
Total expenditure | £120 | £120 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2019 | 31 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2018 | 14 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2017 | 19 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 25/03/2011
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR ALL OBJECTS WHICH ARE REGARDED AS EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE IN PARTICULAR KENYA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window