REPTON BOXING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Boys Boxing Club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Tower Hamlets
Governance
- 14 December 2011: Standard registration
- REPTON BOXING CLUB (Working name)
- REPTON BOYS CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID ROBINSON | Chair | 12 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
CHRIS MEDINA | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HILL | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
DARREN BARKER | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
RYAN PICKARD | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
GARY COOK | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
MAURICE HOPE | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN MURPHY | Trustee | 21 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY JAGO | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
ADEBAYO OLAWALE EDUN BSC., M.A. | Trustee | 12 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
ERGIN OMER | Trustee | 12 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
WENDEL HENRY | Trustee | 12 April 2011 |
|
|||||
JOHN RIDER | Trustee | 12 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £279.36k | £35.47k | £37.09k | £90.15k | £91.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £265.85k | £58.62k | £24.00k | £121.38k | £115.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 May 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 10 May 2024 | 10 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 14 June 2023 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 14 June 2023 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 01 June 2022 | 32 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 01 June 2022 | 32 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 09 July 2021 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 09 July 2021 | 70 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2019 | 08 September 2020 | 131 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2019 | 08 September 2020 | 131 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/09/2010 AS AMENDED ON 05/12/2011
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF TOWER HAMLETS AND THE PUBLIC GENERALLY BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND OPPORTUNITIES FOR BOXING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2-10 EZRA STREET
LONDON
E2 7RH
- Phone:
- 02077398567
- Email:
- info@reptonboxingclub.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window