Trustees BARBADOS OVERSEAS NURSES ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1142895

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHERMANE WILLIS PETERS | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Morris Springer | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maria Layne Springer | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ceifred Goodman | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ORIEL WEEKES | Trustee | 15 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
MARIE ROSETTA GREENRIDGE | Trustee | 15 July 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.