Trustees THE BUDDHAPADIPA TEMPLE TRUST
Charity Number: 1142864

Charity reporting is overdue by 206 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sohpita Tuck | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Robert Ellis | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Phramaha Laow Panyasiri | Trustee | 04 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
BHATSAKORN KOTA | Trustee | 07 January 2016 |
|
|||||
PHRASUTAS PHUANGPHUA | Trustee | 12 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
PHRAKRU SAMU LOM | Trustee | 13 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
SERMSAK NARINWONG | Trustee | 13 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
WANJAI POONUM | Trustee | 13 July 2011 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.