Financial history THE ALEXANDER MOSLEY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1142898
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £7.98m £6.85m £291.37k £91.34m £46.95m
Total expenditure £14.45m £874.66k £7.19m £178.74k £3.27m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £7.62m £6.67m N/A £90.51m £42.30m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment £362.62k £182.30k N/A £822.69k £4.65m
Income - Other £0 £0 N/A £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 N/A £90.51m £41.52m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £14.45m £855.95k N/A £71.71k £2.93m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £18.72k N/A £100.80k £325.90k
Expenditure - Governance £1.92k £1.92k N/A £2.09k £8.36k
Expenditure - Grants institution £14.38m £831.00k N/A £20.00k £2.83m
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £18.72k N/A £100.80k £325.90k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 N/A £6.23k £13.50k