THE GOODNEWS MISSION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our vision is to take the Gospel to the communities and share and demonstrate the love of Jesus Christ through our giving. We aim to build, empower and enable the communities to replicate this principle. We reach out by forming good relationships with organisations and individuals far and wide and sharing our faith in the process. We also run home coffee mornings & provide community meals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Havering
- Nigeria
Governance
- 26 April 2011: Standard registration
- THE GOODNEWS CHURCH (ROMFORD) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Oyin Ayandokun | Chair | 26 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
Christian Ayandokun | Trustee | 22 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Read | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ike Umunna | Trustee | 11 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mavis Lindsay | Trustee | 03 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.77k | £8.80k | £8.04k | £12.10k | £27.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.23k | £4.38k | £7.14k | £6.09k | £25.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 04 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Accounts not yet received | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01/02/2011 AS AMENDED ON 26 JAN 2018 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 26 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN ROMFORD ESSEX AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND TO FULFIL SUCH OTHER PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND ARE CONNECTED WITH THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE TRUST.
Area of benefit
ROMFORD, ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Burgess Avenue
STANFORD-LE-HOPE
Essex
SS17 0AZ
- Phone:
- 07397927573
- Email:
- gmp@gnmission.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window