EPHRAIMITE CHARITY ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The prevention or relief of poverty by providing grants, items and services to individuals in need and/or charities or other organisations working to prevent or relieve poverty
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2019
People

2 Trustee(s)
16 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barking And Dagenham
- Enfield
- Central African Republic
- Nigeria
- São Tomé And Principe
- South Africa
Governance
- 14 September 2011: Standard registration
- NORTH LONDON MENTAL HEALTH ORGANISATION (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EPHRAIM EKPENYONG | Chair | 12 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
ENO OKON-DAN | Trustee | 12 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2015 | 30/11/2016 | 30/11/2017 | 30/11/2018 | 30/11/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.50k | £22.65k | £16.50k | £20.30k | £22.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.95k | £20.66k | £15.60k | £17.90k | £18.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 241 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 241 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 607 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 607 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 972 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 972 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1337 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1337 days | |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 01 December 2020 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/08/2011
Charitable objects
THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
100a Redlands Road
Enfield
EN3 5HJ
- Phone:
- 07916119084
- Email:
- Ephraimitecorg@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window