MAKE A DIFFERENCE (SRI LANKA) LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity works with Internally Displaced People (IDP) in SriLanka to provide long term sustainable means for living. It provides livelyhood to people who were affected by civil war and sets up educational programmes, starter businesses support, housing, agricultural support and homecraft support.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charitable Activities
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 30 August 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeyakumar Thiagarajah | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Theophilus Samuel David Rajoopillai | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Marshall Figurado | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Veerasingam Mahalingasivam | Trustee | 25 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thiruparan Thuraisingam | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Laleesh Chandramoorthy | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Karthigaayini Nadanakumaran | Trustee | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
RATNASWAMY MUTHUKUMAR | Trustee | 30 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.34k | £9.17k | £22.93k | £6.22k | £24.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £72 | £482 | £12.07k | £14.76k | £28.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 16 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 April 2021 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Memorandum
Charitable objects
THE RELEIF AND ASSISTANCE OF THE INTERNALLY DISPLACED PEOLPE IN THE VANNI AND BATTICOLA AREAS OF SRI LANKA WHO ARE OR HAVE BEEN AFFECTED BY YEARS OF WAR IN SUCH WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF DEVELOPMENTAL PROGRAMMES TO RELEIVE POVERTY AND DISTRESS, ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROMOTE AND PROTECT GOOD HEALTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 BRISTOW ROAD
HOUNSLOW
TW3 1UP
- Phone:
- 02085777788
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window