DART MUSIC FESTIVAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To apply the Charity's income in furthering the following objectives: a. To advance the education of the public in general on the subject of music. b. To provide financial assistance to individuals and informal groups of individuals and to organisations residing and operating in and around Dartmouth to support the development of musical ability and talent and to further musical education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Devon
Governance
- 10 May 2011: Standard registration
- DMFF (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robin Douglas Anthony Foale | Chair | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Squire | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Jane Bussell | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julie Archer | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Louise Rae | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Alban Harris | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Helen Heywood | Trustee | 03 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Jayne Chandler | Trustee | 06 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £1.50k | £10.00k | £1.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.86k | £2.44k | £562 | £4.58k | £3.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 09 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 02/11/2010
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL ON THE SUBJECT OF MUSIC. 2. PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE IN THE FORM OF GRANTS OR LOANS TO INDIVIDUALS AND INFORMAL GROUPS OF INDIVIDUALS AND TO ORGANISATIONS RESIDING AND OPERATING IN AND AROUND DARTMOUTH TO SUPPORT THE DEVELOPMENT OF MUSICAL ABILITY AND TALENT AND TO FURTHER MUSICAL EDUCATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bishop Fleming
4 North East Quay
PLYMOUTH
PL4 0BN
- Phone:
- 07786 240619
- Email:
- robin.foale@btopenworld.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window