IRONBRIDGE GORGE BRASS BAND FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
to promote Brass Music by showcasing bands of all standards and abilities from the Shropshire area and further afield, in a non-competitive environment. to encourage people of all ages and cultures to engage with brass band music both as a player or follower and also, those new to this type of music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,700 from 3 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Shropshire
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 19 July 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NEIL ANDREW FURY RGN | Chair | 19 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Gillian Evans | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
ANNETTE FURY | Trustee | 12 May 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.50k | £2.00k | £7.52k | £5.75k | £13.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.77k | £420 | £98 | £9.19k | £10.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.70k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION CONSTITUTION AS AMENDED ON 16/07/2011 as amended on 23 Jul 2019 as amended on 19 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE GROUP SHALL BE: TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE PLAYING OF BRASS INSTRUMENTS AND THEIR APPRECIATION OF BRASS BAND MUSIC. TO ENCOURAGE PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF BRASS BAND MUSIC, AND TO STIMULATE INTEREST IN THE ART OF THE BRASS BAND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY, AND ESPECIALLY IN THE DISTRICT OF IRONBRIDGE GORGE BY THE PRESENTATION OF CONCERTS, PERFORMANCES, AND OTHER ACTIVITIES DURING THE FESTIVAL PERIOD AND AT SUCH OTHER TIMES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Caughley Close
BROSELEY
Shropshire
TF12 5SP
- Phone:
- 07399273235
- Email:
- NEILFURY@HOTMAIL.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window