Word Up North Limited

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of annual literature festival and associated developments and year round projects involving creative writing, reading and live literature.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £160,953 from 4 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
66 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 29 March 1973: Standard registration
- THE ILKLEY LITERATURE FESTIVAL (Working name)
- ILKLEY LITERATURE FESTIVAL LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof Francis James Finlay | Chair | 15 March 2023 |
|
|||||
John Peter Dignum | Trustee | 30 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Professor Gregory Radick | Trustee | 13 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kitty Wright | Trustee | 27 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
CATHY BAXANDALL | Trustee | 13 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
ELLEN TERESA THORPE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £394.79k | £227.86k | £294.66k | £329.36k | £359.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £362.96k | £226.71k | £283.29k | £334.96k | £366.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £147.92k | £193.70k | £208.85k | £168.70k | £160.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/07/1972 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 31/07/2013 as amended on 11 Apr 2023
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF ARTISTIC TASTE AND KNOWLEDGE AND THE UNDERSTANDING AND APPRECIATION OF LITERATURE AND THE OTHER ARTS AMONGST THE GENERAL PUBLIC
Area of benefit
ILKLEY AND WHARFEDALE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Second Floor Offices
Fairfax House
38 The Grove
Ilkley
- Phone:
- 01943 601210
- Email:
- admin@wordupnorth.org.uk
- Website:
-
wordupnorth.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window