Financial history ROTARY CLUB OF THE CONWY VALLEY TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1141620
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £38.60k £33.96k £1.23k £8.94k £7.25k
Total expenditure £22.60k £40.41k £3.97k £7.28k £6.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.50k £26.68k N/A N/A N/A