THE EDUCATION ENDOWMENT FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1142111
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancement of education for the benefit of the public by a) making grants to schools other not for profit organisations to fund projects which seek to address low educational attainment; and b) supporting and disseminating the results of research in to ways to mitigate the factors that cause or contribute to, and successful strategies for dealing with, low educational attainment.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity has one or more trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 May 2011: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • EEF (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dame Christine Bridget Gilbert Chair 01 January 2023
None on record
Zoe Ann Lewis Trustee 18 June 2024
None on record
Graham Clive Elton Trustee 01 January 2024
THE NATIONAL YOUTH THEATRE OF GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
THE GREATER SHARE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Sonia Elaine Thompson Trustee 01 January 2023
None on record
Sara Jane Breeden Trustee 21 September 2022
None on record
Sir Kevan Collins Trustee 11 October 2021
None on record
Hanneke Smits Trustee 11 December 2018
None on record
Lucy Lauris Heller Trustee 21 June 2018
PURPOSEFUL VENTURES
Recently registered
Naomi Eisenstadt Trustee 21 June 2018
None on record
SIR PETER OLIVER GERSHON CBE FRENG Trustee 05 October 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.95m £42.67m £34.10m £156.08m £17.64m
Total expenditure £21.12m £35.35m £57.27m £30.95m £30.23m
Income from government contracts £2.57m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.73m £37.94m £30.40m £15.12m £8.74m
Income - Donations and legacies £8.38m £42.37m £33.90m £154.79m £17.21m
Income - Other trading activities £163.39k £245.61k £135.06k £95.82k £287.91k
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £405.01k £56.20k £59.52k £1.19m £137.69k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £20.54m £34.82m £56.80m £30.49m £29.56m
Expenditure - Raising funds £573.66k £536.22k £465.24k £456.17k £670.93k
Expenditure - Governance £136.16k £142.07k £126.93k £115.92k £130.85k
Expenditure - Grants institution £17.41m £29.36m £51.89m £23.98m £20.79m
Expenditure - Investment management £348.18k £269.78k £253.18k £283.27k £486.61k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £345.47k £102.56m £373.59k £390.39k £498.60k
Long-term investments £73.57m £356.44k £64.99m £196.74m £196.35m
Other assets £11.65m £50.16m £10.27m £6.20m £6.50m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £25.84m £77.32m £22.99m £25.71m £25.34m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 07 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 07 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 21 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 21 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 11 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 16 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 30 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 30 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
EDUCATION ENDOWMENT FOUNDATION
5TH FLOOR
MILLBANK TOWER
21-24 MILLBANK
LONDON
Phone:
02045363999