THE UK KARTIKA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The UK Kartika Foundation is a charity to help improve the education and health of Indonesian children, by providing health centres and schools. 163,000 Indonesian children will die before they reach their fifth birthday, often from easily preventable diseases. Meanwhile the poor quality of education in Indonesia has resulted in over 1,000,000 children dropping out of junior school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Indonesia
Governance
- 22 June 2011: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joana Schliemann | Trustee | 22 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
KARTIKA SOEKARNO | Trustee | 22 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
BRYAN SANDERSON CBE | Trustee | 05 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.00k | £25.00k | £24.38k | £5.00k | £4.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.00k | £1.00k | £10.00k | £1.50k | £6.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 22 May 2024 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 18 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TrustDeed
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE: TO SUPPORT AND PROMOTE SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND CAUSES UNDERTAKEN IN THE ISLANDS OF INDONESIA AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION MAY DETERMINE (AND INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING): 1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF SOCIALLY AND/OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN AND ADULTS RESIDENT IN THE ISLANDS OF INDONESIA 2. TO ADVANCE THE HEALTH AND MEDICAL CARE OF SOCIALLY AND/OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED CHILDREN AND ADULTS RESIDENT IN THE ISLANDS OF INDONESIA 3. TO SUPPORT AND PROVIDE FUNDING FOR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WHO UNDERTAKE CHARITABLE WORK IN INDONESIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLAT 2
25 ENNISMORE GARDENS
LONDON
SW7 1AB
- Phone:
- 02031550084
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window