SENS FOUNDATION EUROPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity seeks to: make grants to qualified organisations or individuals for scientific research in support of our charitable purposes; advance the education of the public in the field of regenerative medicine; and influence individuals to work in the field of regenerative medicine.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- United States
Governance
- 24 June 2011: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADRIAN LEE CULL | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Avijit Guha Roy | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
David Kenneth Chambers | Trustee | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
BARBARA JEANNE LOGAN | Trustee | 23 May 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.98k | £47.39k | £401.62k | £7.05k | £5.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.39k | £101.39k | £107.73k | £311.20k | £5.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 December 2023 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 November 2021 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 24 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/11/2009
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (1) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE, PROTECT AND ADVANCE ALL OR ANY ASPECTS OF THE HEATH OF ELDERLY PERSONS; (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE FIELD OF REGENERATIVE MEDICINE; (3) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE.
Area of benefit
EUROPE
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o KM Chartered Accountants
1st Floor, Block C, The Wharf
Manchester Road
BURNLEY
Lancashire
BB11 1JG
- Phone:
- 01282426331
- Email:
- david.chambers@srfeu.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window