SISTEMA ENGLAND LTD

Charity number: 1142615
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sistema England, founded by Julian Lloyd Webber, aims to transform the lives of children and their communities through the power of orchestral music making, as part of the international El Sistema movement.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021

Total income: £32,866
Total expenditure: £297,052

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 June 2011: Standard registration
  • 31 August 2023: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
  • 31 August 2023: Funds transferred to 1169328 THE NUCLEO PROJECT
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • IN HARMONY (ENGLAND) (Working name)
  • IN HARMONY SISTEMA ENGLAND (Working name)
  • IN HARMONY LIMITED (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £188.23k £254.75k £422.92k £68.57k £32.87k
Total expenditure £229.95k £301.15k £40.44k £118.98k £297.05k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 02 September 2022 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 September 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time