JUNIOR RANKS WELFARE FUND RAF (MOD ST ATHAN)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity aim to promote military efficiencey by the provision and support of social, sporting and other facilities for the efficiency and well being of service men and service women.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Vale Of Glamorgan
Governance
- 13 June 2011: Standard registration
- 18 August 2021: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
- SERVICE INSTITUTE FUND RAF (MOD ST ATHAN) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2016 | 31/01/2017 | 31/01/2018 | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.98k | £71.06k | £64.23k | £62.83k | £36.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.82k | £101.97k | £73.23k | £75.04k | £52.81k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2019 | 08 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2019 | 08 October 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2018 | 11 September 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2018 | 11 September 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ADOPTED 07/09/2006 AS AMENDED ON 01 FEB 2015
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECT (THE OBJECT) IS THE PROMOTION OF MILITARY EFFICIENCY BY THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF MESS, SOCIAL, SPORTING AND OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE EFFICIENCY AND WELL-BEING OF SERVICEMEN AND SERVICEWOMEN. THE OBJECTS ALSO EXTEND TO MAKING GRANTS TO ANY ACTIVITY WHICH IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES IS IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTIVES OF THE CHARITY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window