WORK AND LEARN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity offers free educational and training events, and counselling and mentoring opportunities for young individuals to achieve its objectives. It has a pool of collaborators from academia and industry to provide educational and training opportunities in science and engineering. In particular, educational objectives are met through the organisation of free e-learning courses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
- Leicestershire
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 16 June 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Maneesha Singh | Trustee | 30 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sameer Singh | Trustee | 29 March 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.00k | £2.49k | £8.08k | £3.89k | £500 | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.50k | £10.06k | £11.66k | £3.08k | £585 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 March 2025 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 March 2025 | 412 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 July 2023 | 169 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 July 2022 | 155 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 July 2022 | 520 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/03/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14/06/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN THE EAST MIDLANDS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING DISCIPLINES. THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT IN THE EAST MIDLANDS FOR TEH PUBLIC BENEFIT IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF INDUSTRIAL SKILLS TRAINING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
410 Park Road
Loughborough
LE11 2HN
- Phone:
- 01509551822
- Email:
- Secretary.WAL@gmail.com
- Website:
-
work-and-learn.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window