SHAMMAH INTERNATIONAL MINISTRIES

Charity Number: 1145275
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE PRINCIPLE PURPOSE OF CHARITY IS TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND IMPACT LIVES THROUGH THE PROPAGATION OF THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST ACCORDING TO THE HOLY SCRIPTURE. THE LEADERSHIP SHALL ENGAGE IN OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES AS DEEMED NECESSARY FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT BY INTERACTING WITH LOCAL COMMUNITIES; THUS EMPOWERING PEOPLE TO IDENTIFY THEIR POTENTIAL AND LIVE LIVES IN A POSITIVE MANNER.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £18,848
Total expenditure: £22,099

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Bedford
  • Buckinghamshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 January 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • SHAMMAH INTERNATIONAL CHURCH (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Joycelyn Annetta Vassel Chair 01 December 2016
None on record
Monica Davis Trustee 17 February 2021
None on record
Jennifer Bryan Trustee 17 February 2021
None on record
CARVEL VASSEL Trustee 23 May 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £14.94k £19.40k £24.17k £17.39k £18.85k
Total expenditure £14.01k £13.46k £10.89k £19.72k £22.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 19 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
61 Bridge Street
KINGTON
HR5 3DJ
Phone:
07961324503
Website:

Shammahinternational.org