ANCHOR CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Healing Waters, MZ and Anchor City Academy are established as working hands of Anchor Care to organise conferences, seminars, educational programes for the general public. AC will specifically deal with the Youth, Adults, Lone Parents, Homeless and Ex Offenders by teaching and developing them to achieve their highest potential in life, and provide welfare support in UK and Africa
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Haringey
- Ghana
Governance
- 21 April 2011: Standard registration
- MZ (Working name)
- MIRACLE ZONE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev KEN OBENG | Chair | 06 April 2011 |
|
|||||
Ben Owusu Domfeh | Trustee | 05 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARY ACQUAH | Trustee | 21 April 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.10k | £5.32k | £513 | £6.40k | £1.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.02k | £5.15k | £497 | £6.30k | £1.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 November 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 May 2023 | 192 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/01/2011 AS AMENDED ON 01/02/2013
Charitable objects
1.TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF CHURCH SERVICES, PRAYER MEETINGS AND LECTURES TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. 2. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Anchor Care
ACCI
Excel House
312 High Road
London
N15 4BN
- Phone:
- 07940478019
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window