THE REPRESENTATIVE BODY OF THE CHURCH IN WALES

Charity Number: 1142813
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Representative Body's key objectives and activities are: 1. To manage its investments; 2. To manage the ecclesiastical and secular property vested in the Representative Body for the uses and purposes of the Church in Wales; 3. To oversee the work of St Michael's College; 4. To provide an efficient and professional administrative service across a wide range of administrative functions.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 May 2013: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

24 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Medwin Hughes Chair 18 November 2021
WELSH NATIONAL OPERA LIMITED
Received: On time
Ian Stuart Loynd Trustee 17 September 2024
None on record
Richard Anning Trustee 21 March 2024
None on record
The Reverend Dr Adrian Morgan Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Nicola Caroline Gibbons Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Dr Hywel Parry-Smith Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Paul Russell Williams Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
Dr Heather Payne Trustee 01 January 2024
None on record
The Venerable Ian Kendall Rees Trustee 01 January 2024
THE MONMOUTH DIOCESAN CLERGY WIDOWS & DEPENDANTS SOCIETY
Received: On time
MONMOUTH DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
MONMOUTH DIOCESAN TRUST
Received: On time
The Venerable Roderick Ernest Alexander Green Trustee 01 January 2024
THE LLANDAFF DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Jeffery Brown Trustee 15 November 2023
None on record
Christopher Clarke Trustee 12 May 2023
None on record
Timothy James Llewelyn Trustee 01 December 2022
THE FRIENDS OF ST DAVIDS CATHEDRAL
Received: On time
Hazel Evans Trustee 19 July 2022
ST DAVIDS DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
Sam Allin Trustee 22 March 2022
CAEREINION MISSION AREA CIO
Recently registered
CAEREINION MISSION AREA
Received: On time
THE ST ASAPH DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
The Most Reverend Andrew Thomas Griffith John Trustee 06 December 2021
BRIDGET BEVAN'S FOUNDATION
Received: On time
POWIS EXHIBITION FUND
Received: On time
OWEN LLOYD'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Rev Miriam Joanna Beecroft Trustee 10 September 2021
ARDAL WEINIDOGAETH BRO CYFEILIOG A MAWDDWY MINISTRY AREA
Received: On time
Jane Heard Trustee 01 January 2021
None on record
Judith Hayward Trustee 05 November 2018
None on record
Rev NIGEL WILLIAMS Trustee 25 September 2018
FRIENDS OF ST ASAPH CATHEDRAL
Received: On time
THE GOODMAN AND RUTHIN CHARITY
Received: On time
THE DEAN AND CHAPTER OF ST ASAPH CATHEDRAL
Received: On time
Venerable PAUL MACKNESS Trustee 01 January 2018
ST DAVIDS DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time
PETER DUNCAN KENNEDY Trustee 01 August 2017
CARDIFF METROPOLITAN UNIVERSITY
Received: On time
MICHAEL LAWLEY Trustee 27 July 2017
THE LLANGASTY RETREAT HOUSE TRUST
Received: On time
THOMAS OWEN SAUNDERS LLOYD Trustee 22 October 2012
ABERGLASNEY RESTORATION TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £23.13m £18.86m £20.26m £22.03m £23.99m
Total expenditure £27.01m £29.15m £30.87m £27.74m £29.07m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £34.00k £120.00k £523.00k £19.00k £326.00k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.64m £728.00k £339.00k £796.00k £834.00k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £21.21m £17.72m £19.15m £20.96m £22.56m
Income - Other £250.00k £290.00k £251.00k £254.00k £263.00k
Income - Legacies £34.00k £119.00k £522.00k £19.00k £326.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £24.00m £26.04m £27.84m £24.46m £25.67m
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.02m £3.11m £3.02m £3.28m £3.40m
Expenditure - Governance £670.00k £686.00k £633.78k £806.90k £858.61k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £10.17m
Expenditure - Investment management £2.79m £2.54m £2.77m £2.98m £2.89m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £271.99m £290.42m £305.87m £237.72m £246.63m
Long-term investments £716.97m £749.25m £824.47m £729.11m £762.97m
Other assets £7.32m £7.67m £8.08m £8.97m £10.04m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£10.25m -£15.61m -£8.79m -£127.00k £1.03m
Total liabilities £202.17m £227.94m £222.50m £145.37m £152.61m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 07 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 07 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 11 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 07 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 07 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 05 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 20 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME DATED 01/06/2011 TAKING EFFECT ON 01/08/2011
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY SHALL BE THE PROVISION AND CONDUCT OF AN INSTITUTION ("THE COLLEGE") FOR THE EDUCATION IN THEOLOGY AND THE PRACTICE OF MINISTRY, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY OF THOSE PREPARING FOR ORDINATION IN THE CHRISTIAN CHURCHES. (2) THE EDUCATION PROVIDED BY THE COLLEGE SHALL RECOGNISE AND RESPECT THE UNIQUE AUTHORITY OF THE HOLY BIBLE AS RECEIVED AND UNDERSTOOD BY THE CHRISTIAN CHURCHES PARTICIPATING IN THE LIFE OF THE COLLEGE.
Area of benefit
Registration history
  • 30 May 2013 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
THE REPRESENTATIVE BODY OF THE
CHURCH IN WALES
4TH FLOOR 2 CALLAGHAN SQUARE
CARDIFF
CF10 5BT
Phone:
02920348200
Email:
No information available