THE INTERNATIONAL COCOA INITIATIVE UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Parent body to International Cocoa Initiative UK is International Cocoa Initiative in Geneva Switzerland that is actively working to eliminate child labour in cocoa growing -- mostly in West Africa. ICI(UK) is presently dormant (with no income/outgoings) but anticipates activities in due time in the above field as, and when, suitable opportunities arise.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Ghana
- Ivory Coast
Governance
- 08 July 2011: Standard registration
- 16 March 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 09 March 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 08 March 2016 | 129 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 20 November 2014 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/03/2011
Charitable objects
2. OBJECTS 2.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 2.1.1 THE PROMOTION OF HUMAN RIGHTS (WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE PREVENTION AND ELIMINATION OF SLAVERY, THE SLAVE TRADE, FORCED OR COMPULSORY LABOUR AND CHILD LABOUR) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD (WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO COUNTRIES WHERE COCOA IS CULTIVATED OR USED IN PRODUCTION) ANY OR ALL OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; (B) OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; (C) RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; (D) RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; (E) PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS; (F) CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW; (G) COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION; (H) RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; (I) PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; (J) PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; (K) INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS; (L) ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS; AND 2.1.2 THE PREVENTION AND RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT THROUGHOUT THE WORLD (WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO COUNTRIES WHERE COCOA IS CULTIVATED OR USED IN PRODUCTION). 2.2 IN THIS ARTICLE 2: 2.2.1 "HUMAN RIGHTS" SHALL HAVE THE MEANING SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS 1948 AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS FROM TIME TO TIME; 2.2.2 "SLAVERY" AND "THE SLAVE TRADE" SHALL HAVE THE RESPECTIVE MEANINGS SET OUT IN THE SLAVERY CONVENTION 1926, THE SUPPLEMENTARY CONVENTION ON THE ABOLITION OF SLAVERY, THE SLAVE TRADE AND INSTITUTIONS AND PRACTICES SIMILAR TO SLAVERY 1956, THE INTERNATIONAL COVENANT ON CIVIL AND POLITICAL RIGHTS 1966 AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONAL CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS FROM TIME TO TIME; 2.2.3 "FORCED OR COMPULSORY LABOUR" SHALL HAVE THE MEANING SET OUT IN THE FORCED LABOUR CONVENTION 1930, THE INTERNATIONAL COVENANT ON CIVIL AND POLITICAL RIGHTS 1966 AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONAL CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS FROM TIME TO TIME; AND 2.2.4 "CHILD LABOUR" SHALL HAVE THE MEANING SET OUT IN THE MINIMUM AGE FOR ADMISSION TO EMPLOYMENT AND WORK CONVENTION 1973, THE WORST FORMS OF CHILD LABOUR CONVENTION 1999 AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS FROM TIME TO TIME.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window