Financial history UK-DRC BRIDGE

Charity number: 1142933
Charity reporting is up to date (4 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.78k £20.98k £22.50k £24.25k £24.58k
Total expenditure £17.60k £20.10k £21.25k £22.65k £23.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A