ST IVES JUMBO ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Increase community participation in healthy recreation by the provision of facilities to enable participation in lug-rigged sailing and by advancing education in the history and use of the Jumbo and the maritime heritage of St. Ives. We have carried out skill building in knotting, talks and film shows on historical fishing/sailing vessels and fisherman of St. Ives and run sailing sessions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Cornwall
Governance
- 19 July 2011: Standard registration
- SIJA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Frisby | Trustee | 16 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Wagstaff | Trustee | 13 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jim Fletcher | Trustee | 13 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
TOBY PROCTER | Trustee | 04 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR SCOTT BOWRING PH.D | Trustee | 19 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
JONNY NANCE | Trustee | 19 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
MATTHEW WILLIAM HAYTER | Trustee | 19 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
JILL BLOCK BA FRSA | Trustee | 07 April 2011 |
|
|||||
KEITH EDWARD JONES BENG MICE | Trustee | 07 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.14k | £8.39k | £4.55k | £6.74k | £5.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.37k | £8.56k | £4.52k | £8.68k | £4.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 04 April 2024 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/02/2008 AS AMENDED ON 21/06/2011
Charitable objects
1.THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES TO ENABLE PARTICIPATION IN LUG RIGGED SAILING. 2.TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND USE OF THE JUMBO AND THE MARITIME HERITAGE OF ST IVES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Teak Studio
Wheal Margery
Carbis Bay
St. Ives
TR26 2RH
- Phone:
- 01736793657
- Email:
- mail@stivesjumbo.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window