Accounts and annual returns AL-FAROOQ ISLAMIC ACADEMY

Charity Number: 1143243
Charity reporting is overdue by 1543 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 82 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 82 days
Annual return 30 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 447 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 447 days
Annual return 30 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 813 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 813 days
Annual return 30 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1178 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1178 days
Annual return 30 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1543 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1543 days