Financial history WOKING COUGARS FOOTBALL CLUB

Charity number: 1143056
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/05/2020 30/05/2021 30/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £64.05k £47.19k £111.34k £86.87k £115.15k
Total expenditure £73.13k £45.97k £118.14k £81.79k £106.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A