THE WELLINGTON DAYCARE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Ipswich Nursery School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Total income includes £159,807 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Suffolk
Governance
- 02 June 2011: Standard registration
- 24 February 2017: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 24 February 2017: Funds transferred to 1129046 BOWS AND ARROWS
- WELLINGTON DAY CARE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £163.44k | £140.60k | £242.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £189.61k | £143.51k | £215.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £159.81k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 05 April 2016 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 05 April 2016 | 65 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 01 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | 01 July 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2012 | 12 September 2013 | 44 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2012 | 12 September 2013 | 44 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INCORPORATED 04/05/2007
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY:- OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY; ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS; INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window