MASJID-E-OWAIS-E-QARNI

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Conduct Daily prayers 2. Classes for Children 3. Lectures for Local Community 5. Enable people of different Faiths to meet, cooperate & understandings of different faiths and backgrounds 6. Take part in International charitable appeals
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Redbridge
- The Gambia
Governance
- 08 June 2011: Standard registration
- BELGRAVE COMMUNITY CENTRE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR SALEH ADAM | Trustee | 08 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
GHAFOOR AHMED | Trustee | 11 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
IFTKHAR AHMED | Trustee | 11 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED ASHRAF | Trustee | 11 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
ADAM PATEL | Trustee | 11 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £278.07k | £172.32k | £249.53k | £433.22k | £345.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £63.37k | £52.38k | £146.55k | £213.21k | £179.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £15.83k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 March 2025 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 26 March 2025 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 April 2024 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 April 2024 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 September 2023 | 216 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 September 2023 | 216 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 03 August 2022 | 184 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 03 August 2022 | 184 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DATED 15/11/2010 as amended on 01 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY ARE BY SUCH MEANS AS ARE CHARITABLE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND MORE PARTICULARLY IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF REDBRIDGE: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE FAITH AND RELIGIOUS PRACTICES OF ISLAM, (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT CONCERNING THE TEACHINGS AND RELIGION OF ISLAM, AND (C) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING OF ANY PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED IRRESPECTIVE OF THEIR NATIONALITY, RACE, ETHNIC ORIGIN AND RELIGIOUS BELIEFS,
Contact information
- Address:
-
MASJID-E-OWAIS-E-QARNI
103-107 Belgrave Road
ILFORD
Essex
IG1 3LG
- Phone:
- 02085186329
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window