Financial history THE MGGS DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1141948
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £35.77k £14.84k £90.35k £37.42k £59.52k
Total expenditure £32.83k £6.77k £27.25k £26.89k £25.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.50k N/A N/A N/A N/A