THE CHRISTCHURCH EARTHQUAKE APPEAL (UK)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
On February 22 2011 a 6.3 magnitude struck the city of Christchurch in the Canterbury region in New Zealand causing widespread damage and loss of life. The charity supports fundraising for Christchurch in the United Kingdom and allocates those funds to earthquake recovery initiatives in the region in a number of areas of need including hardship, education, religion, and recreation and leisure.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
- New Zealand
Governance
- 13 April 2011: Standard registration
- 21 September 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CEA UK (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2012 | 30/04/2013 | 30/04/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.15m | £98.57k | £18.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £357.20k | £364.99k | £338.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.13m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £9.05k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £11.73k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £340.10k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.11k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £340.10k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2014 | 28 February 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2014 | 10 February 2015 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/04/2011
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE COMMUNITY OF CHRISTCHURCH AND THE CANTERBURY REGION IN NEW ZEALAND FROM THE ADVERSE EFFECTS OF THE EARTHQUAKES ON 4 SEPTEMBER 2010 AND 22 FEBRUARY 2011 AND ASSOCIATED EVENTS (INCLUDING ANY AFTERSHOCKS OR SUBSEQUENT EARTHQUAKES) BY FURTHERING ANY OF THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE DIRECTORS SHALL THINK FIT: (1) THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, ILL-HEALTH OR DISABILITY. (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION. (3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF ANY RELIGION THAT IS ACCEPTED AS CHARITABLE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES. (4) THE PROMOTION OF THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (5) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE UNDER THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES.
Area of benefit
CHRISTCHURCH AND THE CANTERBURY REGION IN NEW ZEALAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window