Financial history HUTTON AND SHENFIELD UNION CHURCH

Charity number: 1141799
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £199.80k £141.39k £144.78k £201.40k £191.04k
Total expenditure £200.54k £135.60k £161.51k £210.27k £173.47k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £7.00k N/A