Trustees HUTTON AND SHENFIELD UNION CHURCH
Charity number: 1141799

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alexander Newens Revd. | Chair | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Sweeney | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Castle | Trustee | 24 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cheryl Burns Mrs | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
lindsey Crutchett Mrs | Trustee | 01 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Burns | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Church | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jill Damen | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Selma Wakefield | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Dunn | Trustee | 27 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lyn Corderoy | Trustee | 18 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anna Gibson | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gail Helen Johnson | Trustee | 25 April 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.