THE ISIQALO FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote any charitable purpose including the advancement of education, the relief of poverty, sickness or distress and the preservation and protection of health primarily through the use of surf therapy and related mental health training courses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Liberia
- South Africa
Governance
- 10 June 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROGER BONING | Chair | 01 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
Adekanmi LAWSON | Trustee | 10 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tim Conibear | Trustee | 28 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ann Conibear | Trustee | 28 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES SEAWARD | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
DANIEL GILL | Trustee | 10 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
SIMON JOHN | Trustee | 13 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.36k | £120.37k | £90.04k | £122.24k | £72.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.68k | £170.69k | £130.41k | £85.15k | £66.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 24 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 26 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 26 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 FEB 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 02 JUN 2017
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS OR DISTRESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH PRIMARILY THROUGH THE USE OF SURF THERAPY AND RELATED MENTAL TRAINING COURSES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 Elm Park
The Common
Stanmore
HA7 4BJ
- Phone:
- 01865373494
- Email:
- info@isiqalo.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window