WINDOW OF HOPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AGA activity during the year was mainly fund raising for destitute people in Afghanistan. Activities were at low level with poor response due to operational and administrative difficulties. Therefore it has been renamed Window of Hope. -Provide living place and support orphanage children with disabilities in Afghanistan. -Assist vulnerable families who live under $1 per day in Afghanistan.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 March 2017
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Afghanistan
Governance
- 01 August 2011: Standard registration
- AGA (Working name)
- AFGHAN GLOBAL APPEAL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHABNAM TABIBI | Chair | 14 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nahid Azada Tabibi | Trustee | 12 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
SAYED HASHMAT TABIBI | Trustee | 01 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/03/2013 | 01/03/2014 | 01/03/2015 | 01/03/2016 | 01/03/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.50k | £2.90k | £1.40k | £1.70k | £1.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.95k | £2.68k | £1.05k | £1.40k | £1.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 140 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 140 days | |
Annual return | 01 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 506 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 506 days | |
Annual return | 01 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 871 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 871 days | |
Annual return | 01 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1236 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1236 days | |
Annual return | 01 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1601 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1601 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/04/2011 AS AMENDED ON 23/06/2011 AS AMENDED ON 28/07/2011 AS AMENDED ON 28/11/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF AFGHANS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND AFGHANISTAN BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH SUPPORT AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE. 2. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF AFGHANS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND AFGHANISTAN BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE. 3. TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF AFGHANS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND AFGHANISTAN BY THE PROVISION OF SUCH CHARITABLE SERVICES CALCULATED TO RELIEVE THEIR NEED. 4. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID BENEFICIARIES. 5. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN THE FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
87 Hirst Crescent
WEMBLEY
HA9 7HB
- Phone:
- No information available
- Email:
- window_hope@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window