SANGAT PURCHAR SABHA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
prayer meetings, lectures on Sikh faith, 'sewa' which is unconditional charitable act, volunteers sharing knowledge of music to encourage more members of public to involve. including classes, leisure activities, promotion of religious harmony, other events to encourage younger community members to learn about different faiths and become more involved.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Telford & Wrekin
Governance
- 15 August 2011: Standard registration
- SPS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GURDIAL SINGH | Trustee | 15 August 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.00k | £24.70k | £18.49k | £35.87k | £22.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.01k | £25.02k | £20.18k | £27.93k | £38.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | £12.54k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 November 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 March 2022 | 144 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/11/2001 AS AMENDED ON 11/08/2011
Charitable objects
. TO ADVANCE THE SIKH RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS,LECTURES(PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS}PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON SIKH FAITH, ITS PRINCIPLES, GUIDANCE WHICH EMBRACES AND PROMOTES THE FOLLOWING: COHESION, INCLUSION, EQUALITY, WELLBEING, DIVERSITY, CHARITY & SEWA NOTE "SEWA" TRANSLATED LITERALLY MEANS UNCONDITIONAL CHARITABLE ACTS AND DEEDS FOR MANKIND, THE PRESERVATION OF GOD'S CREATIONS & PLANET "WHICH ONE WOULD NOT REQUIRE OR EXPECT ANYTHING IN RETURN FOR DOING) TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE SIKH RELIGION. 2. TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE PUBLIC WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PRESERVE AND PROTECT HEALTH AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID PUBLIC. 3.THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS HARMONY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY:(FOR EXAMPLE) (A)EDUCATING THE PUBLIC IN DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS BELIEFS INCLUDING AN AWARENESS OF THEIR DISTINCTIVE FEATURES AND THEIR COMMON GROUND TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT FAITHS; (B)PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING AND RESPECT OF THE BELIEFS AND PRACTICES OF DIFFERENT RELIGIOUS FAITHS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Cultural & Community Cohesion Centre
19A Stafford Road
Oakengates
TELFORD
Shropshire
TF2 6JN
- Phone:
- 07891529208
- Email:
- sangatps1@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window