THE LEICESTER ISLAMIC ACADEMY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PURPOSE FOR WHICH THIS TRUST IS ESTABLISHED IS THE FURTHERANCE OF THE EDUCATION OF ALL PUPILS IN ATTENDANCE AT THE LEICESTER ISLAMIC ACADEMY AND OTHER SUCH SCHOOLS ESTABLISHED AND MAINTAINED FOR THIS PURPOSE AND INCLUDING THERE AT THE PROMOTION OF THE TEACHING OF THE RELIGION OF ISLAM ACCORDING TO THE QURAN AND THE TEACHINGS OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMED (PEACE BE UPON HIM)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 15 August 2011: Standard registration
- LEICESTER ISLAMIC ACADEMY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Musa Suleman | Trustee | 13 September 2017 |
|
|||||||
DR M H MUKADAM | Trustee | 23 February 2012 |
|
|
||||||
Mohammed ASHRAF MAKADAM | Trustee | 16 April 2011 |
|
|||||||
ANWAR PATAS | Trustee | 16 April 2011 |
|
|||||||
ABDULHAQ PATEL | Trustee | 16 April 2011 |
|
|||||||
HUSSEIN SULEMAN | Trustee | 16 April 2011 |
|
|||||||
IQBAL ALIBHAI DESAI | Trustee | 16 April 2011 |
|
|||||||
AYUB MAHOMED | Trustee | 16 April 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 December 2023 | 202 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 December 2023 | 567 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 10 September 2020 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/04/2011
Charitable objects
THE TRUST'S OBJECTS (THE OBJECTS) ARE TO ADVANCE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT EDUCATION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING, CARRYING ON, MANAGING AND DEVELOPING AN INDEPENDENT PRIMARY SCHOOL KNOWN AS THE LEICESTER ISLAMIC ACADEMY, A VOLUNTARY AIDED SECONDARY SCHOOL KNOWN AS THE MADANI HIGH SCHOOL, AND SUCH OTHER EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS AS MAY BE ESTABLISHED FROM TIME TO TIME ("THE SCHOOLS") WITH THE PURPOSE OF OFFERING A BROAD CURRICULUM WITH A STRONG EMPHASIS ON, BUT IN NO WAY LIMITED TO, THE PROMOTION OF THE RELIGION OF ISLAM BASED ON THE TEACHINGS OF THE HOLY QUR'AN AND THE SUNNAH OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (P.B.U.H.), ACCORDING TO THE INTERPRETATIONS AND ACCEPTED VIEWS OF THE AHL AL-SUNNAH WA AL-JAMA`AH AS EXPOUNDED BY DEOBANDI SCHOLARS WHO RESPECT ALL THE COMPANIONS OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (P.B.U.H.), WHO FOLLOW ONE OF THE FOUR RECOGNISED SCHOOLS OF ISLAMIC LAW I.E. HANAFI SCHOOL OF LAW AND WHO ACCEPT TASAWWUF (SUFISM) TO BE AN IMPORTANT ASPECT OF ISLAMIC TEACHINGS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE LEICESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Leicester Islamic Academy
320 London Road
Leicester
LE2 2PJ
- Phone:
- 01162702343
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window