MANCHESTER BETH DIN LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To establish and maintain an ecclesiastical court and ancillary services To support Jewish reigious life within Greater Manchester area To licence ,set the Kashrus standards and provide appropriate supervision for kosher establishments and caterers as required
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Salford City
- Trafford
Governance
- 26 May 2011: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rabbi David Eisenberg | Chair | 16 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Rabbi Daniel Yonatan Walker | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rabbi Dovid Yaackov Lewis | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Rabbi Jacob Aaron Rubinstein | Trustee | 16 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £305.02k | £455.31k | £532.11k | £445.17k | £492.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £328.56k | £348.51k | £416.45k | £403.96k | £380.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £107.10k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £425.01k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £416.45k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £6.78k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2023 | 176 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 25 April 2023 | 176 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 September 2021 | 317 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 September 2021 | 317 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 23/12/2010 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/05/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE ORTHODOX JEWISH FAITH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (I) TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN AN ECCLESIASTICAL COURT AND ANCILLARY RELIGIOUS SERVICES: (II) TO SUPPORT JEWISH RELIGIOUS LIFE WITHIN THE GREATER MANCHESTER AREA AND, IF CALLED UPON, BEYOND; (III) TO LICENSE, SET THE KASHRUS STANDARDS AND PROVIDE APPROPRIATE SUPERVISION FOR KOSHER ESTABLISHMENTS AND CATERERS ETC. AS REQUIRED. TO PROVIDE RELIGIOUS ADVICE AND INFORMATION TO BOTH JEWISH AND NON-JEWISH ORGANISATIONS AS REQUIRED; (IV) TO MONITOR THE KOSHER STATUS OF ANY MIKVAOTH (RITUAL BATHS) OPERATING UNDER ITS AEGIS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Manchester Jewish Community Centre
Jubilee School
Bury Old Road
MANCHESTER
M7 4QY
- Phone:
- 0161 740 9711
- Email:
- info@mbd.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window