CORNERSTONE BAPTIST CHURCH, OSWESTRY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO BAPTIST PRINCIPLES BY: REGULAR WORSHIP, PRAYER, BIBLE STUDY, PREACHING AND TEACHING; THE NURTURE AND GROWTH OF CHRISTIAN DISCIPLES; PASTORAL CARE; EVANGELISM AND MISSION LOCALLY, IN OSWESTRY AND SUPPORTING INTERNATIONAL EVANGELISM; EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR CHRISTIAN AND COMMUNITY SERVICE;
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Shropshire
Governance
- 08 August 2011: Standard registration
- 17 September 2024: Removed (Does not operate)
- 17 September 2024: Funds transferred to 1080529 THE HEART OF ENGLAND BAPTIST ASSOCIATION
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.86k | £33.81k | £45.82k | £31.62k | £35.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.61k | £33.59k | £42.73k | £38.37k | £38.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 January 2024 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 January 2024 | 81 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 November 2021 | 8 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
19 October 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
Constitution
Charitable objects
The principal purpose of the Church is the advancement of the Christian faith according to the principles of the Baptist denomination. The Church may also advance education and carry out other charitable purposes in the United Kingdom and/or other parts of the world.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window