THE PHILANTHROPY FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Philanthropy Foundation manages charitable funds on behalf of third parties, both individual and corporate, to help them develop better programmes of philanthropic giving.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 08 February 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES LANDER PIKE | Chair | 10 October 2011 |
|
|||||||
Joseph Mclean | Trustee | 17 January 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Ben George Wilson | Trustee | 23 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £465.31k | £19.08k | £167.69k | £65.01k | £168.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £407.05k | £70.79k | £183.02k | £31.51k | £194.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 16 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 08 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 02 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 11 February 2022 | 164 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 07 September 2021 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 04/10/2011
Charitable objects
1.1 THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE CAPITAL AND INCOME TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PARTS OF THE CAPITAL, AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER TO, OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF, SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT. 1.2 THIS PROVISION MAY BE AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION BUT ONLY WITH THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE COMMISSION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
45 EAST SHEEN AVENUE
LONDON
SW14 8AR
- Phone:
- 02076808100
- Email:
- charleslpike@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window