Trustees TEIGNBRIDGE COMMUNITY AND VOLUNTARY SERVICES

Charity number: 1142744
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher William Robillard Trustee 20 February 2023
None on record
Donald Graham Walker Trustee 30 September 2022
None on record
Robert Bradshaw Trustee 08 March 2018
None on record
PHILIP MICHAEL AUBREY Trustee 15 November 2012
None on record
CLAIRE KATHLEEN ELIZABETH HARRIS Trustee 12 April 2011
None on record